RI S0152 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The Senate For Years 2023-2024
Title
Senate Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The Senate For Years 2023-2024
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 5 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 5 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/14/2023) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (02/09/2023) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |