RI S0148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows mobile and manufactured homes which are a part of a mobile and manufactured home park to be counted as low and moderate income housing for purposes of compliance with the requirements of the city's or town's comprehensive land use plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low And Moderate Income Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019)
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback