RI S0144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- School Bus Safety Enforcement: would amend the procedures set forth in the School Bus Safety Enforcement Act
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- School Bus Safety Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Beatrice Lanzi [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-09 | House passed Sub B | |
2011-06-07 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-31 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-05-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0144.pdf |