RI S0143 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the number of days a retired municipal employee could work in a calendar year without interruption of pension benefits to ninety (90) days.
Title
Retirement Of Municipal Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Anthony Deluca [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0143.pdf |