RI S0142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the sale of alcoholic beverages on New Year's Day by retail Class A licensees.
Title
Regulation Of Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2021) |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/06/2021) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |