RI S0141 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that all contractual provisions in a firefighters collective bargaining agreement continue until a successor agreement has been reached or an interest arbitration award has been rendered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters' Arbitration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12HouseReferred to House Labor
2023-05-11SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/11/2023)
2023-05-03SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-04-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2023)
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback