RI S0137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates prescription drug marketing by manufacturers using strategies offering various discounts to disguise costs of high priced drugs versus lower costs alternatives and makes discounts available to individuals without health insurance. Eff. 1/1/20.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits--prescription Drug Marketing
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |