RI S0135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes video games from the definition of "motion picture" for the purposes of the Motion Picture Credit Tax Act, and extends from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2024.
Title
Motion Picture Production Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion picture production tax credits (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion picture production tax credits (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |