RI S0134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to obtain search warrants for electronic information, data, location information and other identifying information of subscribers and customers, except in specified circumstances.
Title
Search Warrants -- Electronic Information And Data Privacy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0134.pdf |