RI S0134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the non-resident withholding requirement for a corporation that sells real estate be consistent with the seven percent (7%) corporate income tax rate.
Title
Withholding Of Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |