RI S0128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Alternative Fuel Infrastructure Incentive (would Create Tax Incentives For The Installation Of Alternative Fuel Facilities)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Alternative Fuel Infrastructure Incentive (would Create Tax Incentives For The Installation Of Alternative Fuel Facilities)
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0128.pdf |