RI S0126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that all applicants for driver's licenses and registry-issued identification cards automatically become organ donors unless they execute a declination card.
Title
Anatomical Gifts
Sponsors
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0126.pdf |