RI S0122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Stay Invested in RI Tax Credit authorizing a tax credit against state personal income tax for up to ten (10) years after graduation from an institution of higher education, for graduates who reside and work in Rhode Island.
Title
Stay Invested In Ri Wavemaker Fellowship
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2015) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |