RI S0121 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts qualifying business located within a MED zone in West Warwick from fifty percent (50%) of current sales and use tax for a period of ten (10) years.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/10/2015) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |