RI S0119 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the "lookback" period for repeat offenses involving driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs under § 31-27-2 and for repeat offenses related to failure or refusal to submit to chemical tests under § 31-27-2.1 from 5 years to 10 years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0119.pdf |