RI S0117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a safety barrier or safety netting would be erected on the Mount Hope Bridge, the Claiborne Pell Bridge, and the Jamestown Verrazzano Bridge, no later than January 1, 2023.
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0117.pdf |