RI S0117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gives all state income tax return filers the option to have their tax refund directly deposited into their bank account.
Title
Income Tax Refunds - State Tax Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |