RI S0116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the license plates of a vehicle be confiscated by a police officer if the owner was arrested for driving while their license was suspended, revoked or cancelled for refusing to submit to a chemical test or for operating under the influence.
Title
Suspension Or Revocation Of Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0116.pdf |