RI S0115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax assessors in the cities and towns to use the last statutory update or revaluation as the assessed valuation upon which to levy taxes regarding their real property.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |