RI S0114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gives all state income tax return filers the option to have their tax refund directly deposited into their bank account.
Title
Income Tax Refunds - State Tax Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |