RI S0112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the use of electronic monitoring of a resident’s room or private living unit within a nursing home or assisted living facility.
Title
Electronic Monitoring In Nursing And Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0112.pdf |