RI S0111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Richmond, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the Town of Richmond on November 4, 2008 and November 8, 2022.
Title
Relating To The Ratification Of The Home Rule Charter Of Richmond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/09/2023) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |