RI S0110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging.
Title
Pfas In Food Packaging
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Environment & Agriculture |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0110.pdf |