RI S0103 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a pharmacist to prescribe and dispense hormonal contraceptives, provided that the pharmacist has completed a training program approved by the state board of pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-23SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2023-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-13SenateProposed Substitute
2023-06-12SenateScheduled for consideration (06/14/2023)
2023-04-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback