RI S0103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refunds a portion of the minimum tax paid to corporations whose gross receipts are less than five hundred dollars ($500), but never more than five hundred dollars ($500) minimum tax paid.
Title
Business Corporation Tax And Franchise Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0103.pdf |