RI S0101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends authority of physical therapists to order x-rays until December 31, 2025.
Title
Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-06 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2023) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |