RI S0100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Electricians (would Include The Maintenance Of Certain Electrical Components Within The Purview Of This Chapter.)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Electricians (would Include The Maintenance Of Certain Electrical Components Within The Purview Of This Chapter.)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2013) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0100.pdf |