RI S0098 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals The Public Utility Securitization Act (ยงยง39-1-43 to 60), passed in 1997.
Title
Securitization Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |