RI S0091 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes office of inspector general which would be charged with preventing fraud and mismanagement of public funds, regardless of their source and would oversee all state programs and operations.
Title
Establishing An Office Of Inspector General
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0091.pdf |