RI S0091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes office of inspector general which would be charged with preventing fraud and mismanagement of public funds, regardless of their source and would oversee all state programs and operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing An Office Of Inspector General

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback