RI S0089 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 - THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Prohibits the use of a school district's listserv to distribute any political advertisement, invitation, and/or propaganda.
Title
Offenses Pertaining To Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-15 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |