RI S0080 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax assessors to use the last revaluation as the assessed valuation.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |