RI S0078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a person to make satisfactory arrangements for the payment of motor vehicle fines or costs, and would permit a person to request an ability to pay hearing before a license is suspended for failure to pay such fines or costs.
Title
Suspension Or Revocation Of Licenses - Violations
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-22 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |