RI S0073 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits possession of firearms on school grounds except for peace officers, retired law enforcement officers, persons under contract to provide school security services, and unloaded firearms in locked containers or a locked rack on motor vehicles.
Title
The Harold M. Metts School Safety Act Of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |