RI S0073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the tax administrator to commence any action for collection of personal income tax due and payable within ten (10) years of April 15 of the year the tax return was or would have been filed.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0073.pdf |