RI S0070 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that parole board members appointed by the governor require the advice and consent of the senate.
Title
Correctional Institutions - Parole Board
Sponsors
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |