RI S0069 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals to make or cause to be made annual unannounced inspections and investigations of community residences.
Title
The Licensure, Inspections And Investigations Of Developmental Disabilities Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |