RI S0068 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires free lunches to be provided for all elementary and secondary students attending public schools, to the extent state and federal funds are available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Aid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17HouseReferred to House Finance
2023-05-16SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/16/2023)
2023-05-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023)
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback