RI S0066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the children’s cabinet, in conjunction with the department of education, to develop and implement strategies to improve the compensation of early educators.
Title
Rhode Island Early Educator Investment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |