RI S0066 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of business regulation to determine the status of insurers for coordination of benefits purposes when there are two or more insurers.
Title
Health Care Insurers -- Coordination Of Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0066.pdf |