RI S0062 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-31 - Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-31 - Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds climate change, sea-level rise and coastal resiliency to the analysis of data of the strategic plan for economic development policy.
Title
Long-term Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2023) |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2023) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |