RI S0062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 Senate Finance Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires municipalities to exempt from taxation the real property of a surviving spouse of a law enforcement officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty, who occupies the real property as their principal place of residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateScheduled for consideration (06/20/2019)
2019-05-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback