RI S0062 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Scott Avedisian to join Annmarie Pedro and Steven Matthew Carson in marriage on or about March 24, 2018, within the Town of North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-02 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/02/2017) |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (01/26/2017) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |