RI S0059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Frank S. Lombardi to join Jeffrey Ryan Beliveau and Alyssa Fioravanti in marriage on or about February 4, 2017, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-01-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-01-25 | House | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |