RI S0054 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds urns and shrouds, prayer cards and other items customarily sold or provided by a funeral director to those funeral items which are already exempt from sales and use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback