RI S0050 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratify the town of Jamestown Home Rule Charter amendment to Section 219 of the charter adopted at a November 3, 2020 referendum, concerning the process and procedures by which voter initiative can be activated.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendment To The Charter Of The Town Of Jamestown
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/10/2021) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |