RI S0047 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes title of chapter 37.2 of title 5 and throughout, replacing the words "Oriental medicine" with "Chinese medicine". Allows individuals who are otherwise certified, to practice acupuncture & Chinese medicine using Chinese medical diagnostic methods.
Title
The Healing Art Of Acupuncture And Oriental Medicine
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-15 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |