RI S0046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a school district to conduct instruction through virtual education up to five (5) days when schools have been closed due to inclement weather, emergency or any nonscheduled school closings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Committees And Superintendents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2019)
2019-06-19HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-18SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback