RI S0045 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the Wavemaker Fellowship Program to include public school teachers in the high-need fields of science, technology, engineering and mathematics.
Title
Stay Invested In Ri Wavemaker Fellowship
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |