RI S0044 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows municipalities to establish a program providing property tax exemption to active duty individuals who volunteer services as a firefighter or emergency medical technician.
Title
Volunteer Firefighter/emergency Medical Technician Property Tax Exemption Enabling Legislation
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |